This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/21/2021 at 04:10:39 (UTC).

WEST WASHINGTON INVESTORS, L.P., A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP VS KNOTEL, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/09/2020 WEST WASHINGTON INVESTORS, L P , A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against KNOTEL, INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK H. EPSTEIN. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1708

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK H. EPSTEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WEST WASHINGTON INVESTORS L.P. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Defendants

KHANNA AMIT

LEE EUGENE

KNOTEL INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

12211 WASHINGTON BLVD LA LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

GLUCK MATTHEW

Other Attorneys

CLARK CHARLES

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

9/15/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/6/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

5/25/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Answer

3/25/2021: Answer

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

2/24/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

2/24/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)

2/25/2021: Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)

Amended Complaint

1/7/2021: Amended Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/7/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

1/21/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)

2/9/2021: Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)

Proof of Personal Service

12/1/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/9/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/9/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/9/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/9/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

11/9/2020: Complaint

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by West Washington Investors, L.P., a California limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department R, Mark H. Epstein, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (ReBankruptcy) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department R, Mark H. Epstein, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (ReBankruptcy) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Knotel, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department R, Mark H. Epstein, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Amit Khanna (Defendant); Eugene Lee (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy); Filed by 12211 Washington Blvd LA LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by West Washington Investors, L.P., a California limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by West Washington Investors, L.P., a California limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by West Washington Investors, L.P., a California limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by West Washington Investors, L.P., a California limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint; Filed by West Washington Investors, L.P., a California limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by West Washington Investors, L.P., a California limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by West Washington Investors, L.P., a California limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by West Washington Investors, L.P., a California limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by West Washington Investors, L.P., a California limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by West Washington Investors, L.P., a California limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KNOTEL INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CLARK CHARLES