This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/05/2021 at 22:27:52 (UTC).

WEST-TECH MECHANICAL, INC. VS PINNER CONSTRUCTION CO., INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/28/2020 WEST-TECH MECHANICAL, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PINNER CONSTRUCTION CO , INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CURTIS A. KIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0917

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Glendale Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CURTIS A. KIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WEST-TECH MECHANICAL INC.

Defendants

PINNER CONSTRUCTION CO. INC.

UNITED STATES FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIRE DAVID

Defendant Attorney

KELLAM NEWT W

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

3/10/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 03/10/2021

3/10/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 03/10/2021

Answer

1/11/2021: Answer

Answer

1/11/2021: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

1/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

Proof of Service by Mail

12/28/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

12/28/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/28/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/28/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/28/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

10/28/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/28/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

10/28/2020: Complaint

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2021
  • Hearing04/26/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department E at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 03/10/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Pinner Construction Co., Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Hartford Fire Insurance Company (Defendant); United States Fire Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by West-Tech Mechanical, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by West-Tech Mechanical, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by West-Tech Mechanical, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by West-Tech Mechanical, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by West-Tech Mechanical, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PINNER CONSTRUCTION CO. INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where UNITED STATES FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SWIRE DAVID ALLEN II