Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/07/2021 at 14:10:39 (UTC).

WEST, CHARYNE L. VS WEST, ALLEN L., SR

Case Summary

On 10/24/2019 WEST, CHARYNE L filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against WEST, ALLEN L , SR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Whittier Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CLAY, CHARLES Q.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1977

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Whittier Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CLAY, CHARLES Q.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WEST CHARYNE L.

Respondent

WEST ALLEN L. SR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

DAHAN NANCY WEINBERG

VALENCIA BENJAMIN

Respondent Attorneys

CASILLAS MARIO ESQ

IBARRA STEVEN

Other Attorneys

CARFRAE DOROTHY L

 

Court Documents

Order - Appointing Counsel For A Child-Corrected 4/8/2021

3/9/2021: Order - Appointing Counsel For A Child-Corrected 4/8/2021

Order - Post Parenting Plan Assessment Orders

3/9/2021: Order - Post Parenting Plan Assessment Orders

OSC - Re Contempt

10/29/2020: OSC - Re Contempt

Substitution of Attorney

11/19/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order

2/18/2021: Minute Order

Responsive Declaration

8/6/2020: Responsive Declaration

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

10/24/2019: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

10/24/2019: Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

10/24/2019: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Order - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

11/13/2019: Order - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

Proof of Service of Summons

11/25/2019: Proof of Service of Summons

FCS-Mediation Memo

12/18/2019: FCS-Mediation Memo

Substitution of Attorney

12/23/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Notice - Rejection - Missing Party's Information and case name

1/10/2020: Notice - Rejection - Missing Party's Information and case name

Declaration - Aubree West

1/10/2020: Declaration - Aubree West

Notice - Rejection - Missing Party's Information and case name

1/10/2020: Notice - Rejection - Missing Party's Information and case name

Minute Order

1/24/2020: Minute Order

Declaration-Notice on Request-Temp Emergency Orders FL-303

1/24/2020: Declaration-Notice on Request-Temp Emergency Orders FL-303

54 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2021
  • Hearing07/13/2021 at 8:30 AM in Department 202 at 7339 South Painter Ave., Whittier, CA 90602; Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Counsel for Child Regarding Qualifications ); Filed by Minor's Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketOrder - Findings and Order After Hearing; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 202, Clay, Charles Q., Presiding; Request for Order re: Modification Hearing - Held - Order Made

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketReporter Fees Assessed - Split Half Day; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketOrder (Appointing Counsel For A Child-Corrected 4/8/2021 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketOrder (Post Parenting Plan Assessment Orders )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketReporter Fees Assessed - Split Half Day; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketRequest (to Strike in its entirety the untimely Declaration of Respondent in support of Request for Order ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketRFO/MTN - Custody, Visitation, Child and Spousal Support (Attorney fees and costs (Hearing date 1/15/2020) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketWitness List; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARFRAE DOROTHY LOUISE