This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/13/2023 at 14:41:24 (UTC).

WEST CENTRAL PRODUCE, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS WB USC LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/14/2021 WEST CENTRAL PRODUCE, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WB USC LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are OLIVIA ROSALES, MARGARET MILLER BERNAL and LEE W. TSAO. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0601

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

OLIVIA ROSALES

MARGARET MILLER BERNAL

LEE W. TSAO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WEST CENTRAL PRODUCE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

AZINIAN ROBERT

AZINIAN-YAZEJI CHRISTINA AKA CHRISTINA AZINIAN

CATCHRIS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DBA CABO WABO CANTINA HOLLYWOOD

CELEBRITY BURGERS LLC A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DBA WAHLBURGERS LAS VEGAS

CRISTCAT HOLLYWOOD INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA JOHNNY ROCKETS HOLLYWOOD

CWHH INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA CABO WABO CANTINA HOLLYWOOD

JRUCW INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA JOHNNY ROCKETS UNIVERSAL CITY

ROCNEVA INC. A NEVADA CORPORATION DBA JOHNNY ROCKETS SILVERTON CASINO

TINSELTOWN SUNSET LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DBA WAHLBURGERS WEST HOLLYWOOD

WB USC LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DBA WAHLBURGERS LOS ANGELES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TAORMINA COSMO

Defendant Attorneys

MESROBIAN KRIKOR SARKIS

KEROPIAN ARA JOE

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION

3/10/2023: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC); ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE...)

2/24/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC); ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC))

2/10/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC))

Order - ORDER /RULING

1/19/2023: Order - ORDER /RULING

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES FORM ...)

1/19/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES FORM ...)

Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTIONS TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES AND REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SETS ONE

1/11/2023: Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTIONS TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES AND REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SETS ONE

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL MULTIPLE DEFENDANTS TO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF KRIKOR S. MESROBIAN; REQUEST

1/9/2023: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL MULTIPLE DEFENDANTS TO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF KRIKOR S. MESROBIAN; REQUEST

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL MULTIPLE DEFENDANTS TO COMPEL FURTHER PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

1/9/2023: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL MULTIPLE DEFENDANTS TO COMPEL FURTHER PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

Separate Statement - SEPARATE STATEMENT IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL 7 SEPARATE AND UNRELATED DEFENDANTS TO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES

1/9/2023: Separate Statement - SEPARATE STATEMENT IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL 7 SEPARATE AND UNRELATED DEFENDANTS TO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES

Separate Statement - SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL MULTIPLE DEFENDANTS TO COMPEL FURTHER PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

1/9/2023: Separate Statement - SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL MULTIPLE DEFENDANTS TO COMPEL FURTHER PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES

1/9/2023: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

11/14/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Order - COURT ORDER/RULING (HEARING 11-10-22)

11/10/2022: Order - COURT ORDER/RULING (HEARING 11-10-22)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES PRODU...)

11/10/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES PRODU...)

Objection - OBJECTION TO NOTICE AND MOTIONS TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES

11/4/2022: Objection - OBJECTION TO NOTICE AND MOTIONS TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES

Objection - OBJECTION TO NOTICE AND MOTIONS TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES

11/4/2022: Objection - OBJECTION TO NOTICE AND MOTIONS TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES

Objection - OBJECTION TO NOTICE AND MOTIONS TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

11/4/2022: Objection - OBJECTION TO NOTICE AND MOTIONS TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

Notice - NOTICE OF NON-RECEIPT OF OPPOSITION

11/2/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF NON-RECEIPT OF OPPOSITION

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 06/06/2023 at 09:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/10/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketJury Trial (time estimate for trial without prejudice is 5-8 days) scheduled for 06/20/2023 at 09:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/10/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketOn the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by WEST CENTRAL PRODUCE, INC., a California Corporation on 02/01/2022, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by WEST CENTRAL PRODUCE, INC., a California Corporation as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketOn the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by WEST CENTRAL PRODUCE, INC., a California Corporation on 02/01/2022, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by WEST CENTRAL PRODUCE, INC., a California Corporation as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal With Prejudice as to Entire Action of All Parties and All Causes of Action; Filed by: WEST CENTRAL PRODUCE, INC., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: WB USC LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); TINSELTOWN SUNSET LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); JRUCW, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) scheduled for 03/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/10/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses Production of Documents scheduled for 03/16/2023 at 01:30 PM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department C Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/10/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses Special Interrogatories scheduled for 03/16/2023 at 01:30 PM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department C Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/10/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses Form Interrogatories scheduled for 03/16/2023 at 01:30 PM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department C Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/10/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) scheduled for 03/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
81 More Docket Entries
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: WEST CENTRAL PRODUCE, INC., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: ROCNEVA, INC., a Nevada Corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 09/28/2021; Service Cost: 160.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: WEST CENTRAL PRODUCE, INC., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: CELEBRITY BURGERS LLC, a Nevada Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Service Date: 09/24/2021; Service Cost: 160.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/14/2022 at 01:30 PM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Margaret Miller Bernal in Department F Norwalk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: WEST CENTRAL PRODUCE, INC., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: WB USC LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); TINSELTOWN SUNSET LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); JRUCW, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: WEST CENTRAL PRODUCE, INC., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: WB USC LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); TINSELTOWN SUNSET LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); JRUCW, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: WEST CENTRAL PRODUCE, INC., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: WB USC LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); TINSELTOWN SUNSET LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); JRUCW, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******0601 Hearing Date: November 10, 2022 Dept: SEC

WEST CENTRAL PRODUCE, INC. v. WB USC LLC

CASE NO.: *******0601

HEARING: 11/10/22

#2

TENTATIVE ORDER

I. Plaintiff WEST CENTRAL PRODUCE, INC.’s Motion to Compel Further Production of Documents From: (1) WB USC LLC; (2) TINSELTOWN SUNSET LLC; (3) JRUCW, INC.; (4) CWHH, INC.; (5) CATCHRIS, LLC; (6) CRISTCAT HOLLYWOOD, INC.; and (7) CELEBRITY BURGERS, LLC is CONTINUED to Thursday, January 19, 2023 at 10:30 a.m. in Dept. SE-C.

II. Plaintiff WEST CENTRAL PRODUCE, INC.’s Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatories From: (1) WB USC LLC; (2) TINSELTOWN SUNSET, LLC; (3) CWHH, INC.; (4) CATCHRIS, LLC; (5) CRISTCAT HOLLYWOOD, INC. and (6) CELEBRITY BURGERS, LLC is CONTINUED to Thursday, January 19, 2023 at 10:30 a.m. in Dept. SE-C.

III. Plaintiff WEST CENTRAL PRODUCE, INC.’s Motion to Compel Further Responses to Form Interrogatories From: (1) WB USC LLC; (2) TINSELTOWN SUNSET LLC; (3) JRUCW, INC.; (4) CWHH, INC.; (5) CATCHRIS, LLC; (6) CRISTCAT HOLLYWOOD, INC.; and (7) CELEBRITY BURGERS, LLC is CONTINUED to Thursday, January 19, 2023 at 10:30 a.m. in Dept. SE-C.

Moving Party to give Notice.

Plaintiff/Moving Party WEST CENTRAL PRODUCE, INC. ('Plaintiff") failed to indicate the correct hearing on date on each Notice of Motion. The Notices accompanying each Motion erroneously indicate a hearing date of November 22, 2022 at 9:30 a.m. in Dept. C of the Norwalk Courthouse.

The Objections filed on November 4, 2022 raise the Notice defect and further argue that this action is improperly classified as an unlimited case. The Objections do not address the substance of the discovery at issue.

In the interests of judicial efficiency, the matters are CONTINUED as indicated above. Defendants/Opposing Parties are granted leave to file and serve substantive Oppositions per Code in accordance with the new hearing date.

Plaintiff is also granted leave to file and serve substantive Replies per Code in accordance with the new hearing date.