This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/14/2021 at 14:13:33 (UTC).

WESLEY HOWELL VS SERVICEMASTER BY ADVANCED RESTORATION, SP

Case Summary

On 03/04/2021 WESLEY HOWELL filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against SERVICEMASTER BY ADVANCED RESTORATION, SP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAREN NELSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8412

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAREN NELSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HOWELL WESLEY

Defendant

SERVICEMASTER BY ADVANCED RESTORATION SP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ADAMS CHRISTOPHER A

Defendant Attorney

BENAKOTE AMIR DAVID

 

Court Documents

Complaint

3/4/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/4/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/4/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/4/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

4/1/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DESIGNATION) OF 03/17/2021, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

3/17/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DESIGNATION) OF 03/17/2021, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DESIGNATION)

3/17/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DESIGNATION)

Initial Status Conference Order

3/16/2021: Initial Status Conference Order

Status Conference Statement - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

4/23/2021: Status Conference Statement - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

4/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Order - ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE

4/29/2021: Order - ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE

Answer

5/27/2021: Answer

Status Conference Statement - JOINT FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

8/24/2021: Status Conference Statement - JOINT FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

8/27/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2022
  • Hearing02/15/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 17 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 17, Maren Nelson, Presiding; Further Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Further Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketJoint Further Status Conference Statement; Filed by Wesley Howell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Servicemaster by Advanced Restoration, SP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 17, Maren Nelson, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Initial Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketOrder (Authorizing Electronic Service); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketJoint Initial Status Conference Statement; Filed by Wesley Howell (Plaintiff); Servicemaster by Advanced Restoration, SP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Wesley Howell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • Docketat 08:50 AM in Department 17, Maren Nelson, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Complex Designation) of 03/17/2021, Initial Status Conference Order); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: Complex Designation)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Wesley Howell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Wesley Howell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SERVICEMASTER BY ADVANCED RESTORATION SP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ADAMS CHRISTOPHER A