This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/08/2022 at 07:23:46 (UTC).

WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY VS TRUE GLASS AND GLAZING INCORPORATED

Case Summary

On 11/01/2021 WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TRUE GLASS AND GLAZING INCORPORATED. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0167

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

TRUE GLASS AND GLAZING INCORPORATED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AIRES TIMOTHY CARL

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/1/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/1/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/1/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/1/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/19/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/1/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2022
  • Hearing03/02/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 78 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Wesco Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Wesco Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Wesco Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Wesco Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AIRES TIMOTHY CARL