Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/19/2021 at 11:53:37 (UTC).

WENDY HUA VS HUIJUAN LYU

Case Summary

On 01/12/2021 WENDY HUA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HUIJUAN LYU. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1280

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HUA WENDY

Defendant

LYU HUIJUAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHAM RAYMOND

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

2/17/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

2/17/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/12/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/12/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

1/12/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2024
  • Hearing01/09/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • Hearing07/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • Hearing06/28/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Wendy Hua (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Wendy Hua (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Wendy Hua (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less