This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/29/2022 at 22:41:56 (UTC).

WENDI ARTZ, ET AL. VS ABBY BRUNKS, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/22/2019 WENDI ARTZ filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ABBY BRUNKS, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1604

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ARTZ JOHN

ARTZ WENDI

ARTZ WENDI AND JOHN

Defendants

BRUNKS AN INDIVIDUAL ABBY

ACME CLEAN AIR

EM LAB P&K LLC

STILLER DIANA

VM3 ENVIRONMENTAL

LA TESTING

COASTAL PROPERTY MANAGEMENT SOLUTION

BRUNKS JEFF

MCARTHUR TANYA

BRUNKS ABBY

101 OCEAN CONDOMINIUM HOMEOWNERS' ASSOC.

COASTAL PROPERTY MANAGEMENT SOLUTIONS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SEBER JONATHAN

SEBER JONATHAN MICHAEL

Defendant Attorneys

RUBINSTEIN EUGENE M.

CHEN SONIA

VINJE VANESSA

ERSOFF VICTORIA L.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

2/24/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

12/1/2020: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL)

12/9/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL)

Request for Dismissal

9/11/2020: Request for Dismissal

Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANT 101 OCEAN CONDOMINIUM HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATIONS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES; DECLARATION OF EUGENE M. RUBINSTEIN IN SUPP

8/14/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANT 101 OCEAN CONDOMINIUM HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATIONS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES; DECLARATION OF EUGENE M. RUBINSTEIN IN SUPP

Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANT 101 OCEAN CONDOMINIUM HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATIONS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION: DECLARATION OF EUGENE M. RUBINSTEIN IN SUPP

8/14/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANT 101 OCEAN CONDOMINIUM HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATIONS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION: DECLARATION OF EUGENE M. RUBINSTEIN IN SUPP

Separate Statement - SEPARATE STATEMENT DEFENDANT 101 OCEAN CONDOMINIUM HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATIONS SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF ITS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR

8/14/2020: Separate Statement - SEPARATE STATEMENT DEFENDANT 101 OCEAN CONDOMINIUM HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATIONS SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF ITS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR

Separate Statement

8/14/2020: Separate Statement

Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DETERMINE GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

8/14/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DETERMINE GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

Notice of Settlement

8/24/2020: Notice of Settlement

Notice of Change of Firm Name

8/24/2020: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

8/24/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

8/25/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT 101 OCEAN CONDOMINIUM HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATIONS NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT ABBY BRUNKS MOTION TO DETERMINE GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

8/25/2020: Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT 101 OCEAN CONDOMINIUM HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATIONS NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT ABBY BRUNKS MOTION TO DETERMINE GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/25/2020

8/25/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/25/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/24/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/24/2020

4/24/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/24/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

3/18/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

63 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 57; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Wendi Artz (Plaintiff); John Artz (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 57; Jury Trial (, 12-15 day estimate,) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 57; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 57; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Wendi Artz (Plaintiff); John Artz (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 57; Further Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Wendi Artz (Plaintiff); John Artz (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 57; Hearing on Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
86 More Docket Entries
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by John Artz (Plaintiff); Wendi Artz (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketDeclaration ( REGARDING GOOD FAITH ATTEMPT TO MEET AND CONFER); Filed by 101 Ocean Condominium Homeowners' Assoc., (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Wendi Artz (Plaintiff); John Artz (Plaintiff); Wendi and John Artz (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Wendi Artz (Plaintiff); John Artz (Plaintiff); Wendi and John Artz (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketComplaint (1st); Filed by Wendi Artz (Plaintiff); John Artz (Plaintiff); Wendi and John Artz (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketComplaint ( (2nd)); Filed by Wendi Artz (Plaintiff); John Artz (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by John Artz (Plaintiff); Wendi Artz (Plaintiff); Wendi and John Artz (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 101 OCEAN CONDOMINIUM HOMEOWNERS' ASSOC. is a litigant

Latest cases where COASTAL PROPERTY MANAGEMENT SOLUTION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUBINSTEIN EUGENE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHEN SONIA