This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/30/2020 at 00:40:57 (UTC).

WENCESLAO, ERNESTINA VS LOMA, JESUS DELGADILLO

Case Summary

On 02/11/2020 WENCESLAO, ERNESTINA filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against LOMA, JESUS DELGADILLO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DURON, ARMANDO. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0240

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DURON, ARMANDO

 

Party Details

Petitioners

WENCESLAO ERNESTA

WENCESLAO ERNESTINA

Respondent

LOMA JESUS DELGADILLO

 

Court Documents

Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

2/11/2020: Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

2/11/2020: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

2/11/2020: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

2/11/2020: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

2/11/2020: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Proof of Service

2/20/2020: Proof of Service

Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130) - Expiraion date: 3/3/23

3/3/2020: Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130) - Expiraion date: 3/3/23

Minute Order

3/3/2020: Minute Order

Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

3/3/2020: Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department M, Duron, Armando, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Granted - RO Before Evidence by both

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketStipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketRestraining Order After Hearing (Form 130) (Expiraion date: 3/3/23 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.