This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/30/2022 at 05:10:29 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS SERVICE PLATING CO., INC.

Case Summary

On 09/22/2022 WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SERVICE PLATING CO , INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0974

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendant

SERVICE PLATING CO. INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RAMIREZ BROWNING YVONNE

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

9/22/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

9/22/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/22/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/22/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/22/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/22/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/22/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

9/22/2022: Complaint

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/3/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

10/4/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

10/5/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2022
  • Hearing12/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 68 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 68 - Hon. Douglas W. Sterneffective 10/10/2022; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Plaintiff); As to: Service Plating Co., Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Plaintiff); As to: Service Plating Co., Inc. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/26/2022; Service Cost: 112.25; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Plaintiff); As to: Service Plating Co., Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Plaintiff); As to: Service Plating Co., Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Plaintiff); As to: Service Plating Co., Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 12/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 68

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mark V. Mooney in Department 68 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketAddress for Yvonne Ramirez Browning (Attorney) null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RAMIREZ BROWNING YVONNE