This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/29/2020 at 08:50:57 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. VS ROSA GARCIA PELAYO

Case Summary

On 11/13/2019 WELLS FARGO BANK, N A filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ROSA GARCIA PELAYO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0847

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK N.A.

Defendant

PELAYO ROSA GARCIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RAZI-JAFARI JEFFREY

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/13/2019: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/13/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/13/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/13/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/11/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

3/5/2020: Case Management Statement

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/20/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/29/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Dismissal

3/20/2020: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A15, Wendy Chang, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RAZI-JAFARI JEFFREY