Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/07/2020 at 00:20:45 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. VS PHILLIP J. PACE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/07/2018 WELLS FARGO BANK, N A filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against PHILLIP J PACE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7507

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK N.A.

Defendants

PACE PHILLIP J.

FERNANDEZ JESSE

GARCIA JENNIFER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TREDER EDWARD A.

Defendant Attorneys

RYAN GREGORY ROBERT

RYAN GREGORY R.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

12/17/2019: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

12/30/2019: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

8/7/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Case Management Statement

4/26/2019: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

4/29/2019: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/14/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/4/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Answer

1/25/2019: Answer

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/7/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

12/7/2018: Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/7/2018: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/7/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/26/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/26/2018: Proof of Personal Service

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 48, Elizabeth Allen White, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial ((2 day estimate)) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 48, Elizabeth Allen White, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department ; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Clerical Error

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 48, Elizabeth Allen White, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Phillip J. Pace (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Phillip J. Pace (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RYAN GREGORY R.