This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/28/2023 at 07:54:57 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. VS KARLEN DAVTYAN

Case Summary

On 01/05/2023 WELLS FARGO BANK, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KARLEN DAVTYAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is FRANK M. TAVELMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0022

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

FRANK M. TAVELMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK N.A.

Defendant

DAVTYAN KARLEN

North Hollywood, CA 91605-2857

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MULHORN ASHLEY

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/5/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/5/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/5/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

1/5/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/5/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

1/5/2023: Complaint

Proof of Service by Mail

2/21/2023: Proof of Service by Mail

Case Management Statement

2/21/2023: Case Management Statement

Declaration re: Due Diligence

2/28/2023: Declaration re: Due Diligence

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

3/15/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2023
  • Hearing06/27/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department A at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2023
  • Hearing06/27/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department A at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/27/2023 at 09:00 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/27/2023 at 09:00 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department A Held - Continued was rescheduled to 06/27/2023 09:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department A Held - Continued was rescheduled to 06/27/2023 09:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Ashley Mulhorn (Attorney): First Name changed from ASHLEY to Ashley; Last Name changed from MULHORN to Mulhorn; Organization Name: Collection At Law, Inc. APC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketAddress for Ashley Mulhorn (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: KARLEN DAVTYAN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: KARLEN DAVTYAN (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: KARLEN DAVTYAN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: KARLEN DAVTYAN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: KARLEN DAVTYAN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Frank M. Tavelman in Department A Burbank Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less