This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/18/2020 at 07:54:20 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. VS COLEMAN J. HOLLIS, JR., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/18/2019 WELLS FARGO BANK, N A filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against COLEMAN J HOLLIS, JR . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DEIRDRE HILL. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0058

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DEIRDRE HILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK N.A.

Defendants

HOLLIS COLEMAN J. JR.

BUILDING AND SAFETY CITY OF LOS ANGELES DEPARTMENT OF

HOLLIS LESLIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MIKA BRANDON

Defendant Attorney

SEWELL CHARLES DAVID

 

Court Documents

Memorandum - MEMORANDUM OF POINT AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

5/28/2020: Memorandum - MEMORANDUM OF POINT AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Declaration - DECLARATION PLAINTIFF'S DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

5/28/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION PLAINTIFF'S DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Request for Dismissal

5/28/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/8/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Proof of Service by Mail

2/7/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

12/3/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STATUS CONFERENCE RE: POSSIBLE SE...)

12/3/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STATUS CONFERENCE RE: POSSIBLE SE...)

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

12/3/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Case Management Statement

11/13/2019: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by Mail - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

10/25/2019: Proof of Service by Mail - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

10/25/2019: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE

10/8/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE

Proof of Service by Mail

7/3/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/21/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Case Management Statement

6/12/2019: Case Management Statement

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

4/5/2019: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/18/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/18/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (entry of default/default judgment) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: entry of ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketJudgment ([Proposed] Judgment); Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (IN RESPONSE TO OSC RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT); Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketJudgment (request for court judgment); Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default; Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by City of Los Angeles Department of Building and Safety (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MIKA BRANDON