This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/31/2019 at 02:01:16 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK NA VS BANK OF AMERICA NA ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/07/2018 WELLS FARGO BANK NA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BANK OF AMERICA NA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4922

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK N.A.

Defendants

CENICEROS ALEJANDRA

PREECE JASON

HERNANDEZ JR. RAYMOND G.

BANK OF AMERICA N.A.

Not Classified By Court

TEST PARTY FOR TRUST CONVERSION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHAEFFER JOHN ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

ENGER WILLIAM K. ESQ.

FLETCHER LOYST P.

 

Court Documents

Writ of Execution

5/1/2019: Writ of Execution

Request for Dismissal

5/15/2019: Request for Dismissal

Abstract of Judgment?Civil and Small Claims

3/28/2019: Abstract of Judgment?Civil and Small Claims

Stipulation and Order

3/18/2019: Stipulation and Order

Notice

3/19/2019: Notice

Stipulation and Order

3/20/2019: Stipulation and Order

Notice

3/21/2019: Notice

Stipulation

3/7/2019: Stipulation

Stipulation for Judgment

3/7/2019: Stipulation for Judgment

Notice

3/7/2019: Notice

Minute Order

3/7/2019: Minute Order

Unknown

12/14/2018: Unknown

Status Report

12/14/2018: Status Report

Minute Order

9/5/2018: Minute Order

Unknown

8/31/2018: Unknown

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

9/4/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

Unknown

8/22/2018: Unknown

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/21/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2019
  • Docketat 08:32 AM in Department 56; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution ((Los Angeles)); Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketNotice ( of Entry Of Order Dissolving Preliminary Injunction); Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order (STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT RAYMOND G. HERNANDEZ JR.); Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Final Judgment); Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order (STIPULATION TO DISSOLVE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION); Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Hearing on Order to Show Cause); Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
64 More Docket Entries
  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketTEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT ISSUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketDECLARATION OF CHERYL GLASER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketOrder; Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-05-07 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketEx-Parte Application; Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TEST PARTY FOR TRUST CONVERSION is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHAEFFER JOHN