This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/20/2021 at 15:43:42 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK N.A., ET AL. VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/24/2021 WELLS FARGO BANK N A filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM, ANN I. JONES and DANIEL J. BUCKLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9608

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM

ANN I. JONES

DANIEL J. BUCKLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WELLS FARGO BANK N.A.

TRUSTEE OF THE GEORGE B. PRIMBS SURVIVORS' TRUST

Defendants

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

EDISON INTERNATIONAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LACK WALTER JOHN

Defendant Attorney

RECK BELYNDA BRIDGELAND

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2021
  • Hearing11/30/2021 at 1:45 PM in Department 1 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • Docketat 1:45 PM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketNotice order RE: Twenty-Fourth petition for coordination of add-on cases; Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Informal Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Informal Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • Docketat 2:30 PM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference; Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • Docketat 1:45 PM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketOrder Re: Twenty-Fourth Petition for Coordination of Add-On Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Submission of Twenty-Fourth Petition for Coordination of Add-On Cases); Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Court Order Re Complex Determination); Filed by Wells Fargo Bank N.A. (Plaintiff); Trustee of The George B. Primbs Survivors' Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Wells Fargo Bank N.A. (Plaintiff); Trustee of The George B. Primbs Survivors' Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • Docketat 10:14 AM in Department 11, David S. Cunningham, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re. Complex Determination;) of 06/10/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re. Complex Determination;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Wells Fargo Bank N.A. (Plaintiff); Trustee of The George B. Primbs Survivors' Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Wells Fargo Bank N.A. (Plaintiff); Trustee of The George B. Primbs Survivors' Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where EDISON INTERNATIONAL is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LACK WALTER J. ESQ.