Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/09/2019 at 00:06:03 (UTC).

WELL-MED GLOBAL, LLC VS NHT GLOBAL, INC.; ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/27/2017 WELL-MED GLOBAL, LLC filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against NHT GLOBAL, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DEIRDRE HILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2570

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DEIRDRE HILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELL-MED GLOBAL LLC A CALIFORNIA...

Claimants

JEFFREY BUILDING LLC

MORRIS CHRIS

JOHNSON TINA

Defendants

AWESOME SYNERGY INC. A WYOMING CORP.

CROWDER JUSTIN AN INDIVIDUAL

DOES 1-10 INCLUSIVE

NHT GLOBAL INC. A TEXAS CORPORATION

CATTO DAN AN INDIVIDUAL

GARCIA JOE AN INDIVIDUAL

CONARD SANDRA AN INDIVIDUAL

CATTO DAN

CONARD SANDRA

CROWDER JUSTIN

GARCIA JOE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GEOFF J. SPRETER ESQ.

MENDEL PETER

Claimant Attorneys

KENNETH D. WATNICK

WELLMAN SCOTT WADE

Defendant Attorney

GREENBERG GLUSKER FIELDS CLAMAN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/27/2017: Complaint

Notice of Lien

1/4/2018: Notice of Lien

Unknown

1/23/2018: Unknown

Case Management Statement

5/23/2018: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

5/24/2018: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/24/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Unknown

5/25/2018: Unknown

Unknown

6/15/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

6/25/2018: Minute Order

Other -

8/23/2018: Other -

Proof of Service by Mail

9/4/2018: Proof of Service by Mail

Minute Order

11/26/2018: Minute Order

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

12/26/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

12/31/2018: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

1/14/2019: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Minute Order

3/12/2019: Minute Order

Substitution of Attorney

3/12/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order

4/9/2019: Minute Order

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Failure to Appear this day and Failure to Meet and /Confer and provide Deposition dates) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Other - (pre trial orders); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to Appear this day and Failur...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to Appear this day and Failur...) of 04/22/2019 and Pre Trial Orders); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Case Management Conference) of 04/09/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2018
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by NHT GLOBAL, INC., A TEXAS CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • Default Entered; Filed by WELL-MED GLOBAL, LLC, A CALIFORNIA... (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • Answer; Filed by NHT GLOBAL, INC., A TEXAS CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by WELL-MED GLOBAL, LLC, A CALIFORNIA... (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • Stipulation; Filed by NHT GLOBAL, INC., A TEXAS CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • Notice of Lien; Filed by JEFFREY BUILDING, LLC (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by WELL-MED GLOBAL, LLC, A CALIFORNIA... (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • Summons; Filed by WELL-MED GLOBAL, LLC, A CALIFORNIA... (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by WELL-MED GLOBAL, LLC, A CALIFORNIA... (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WELLMAN SCOTT W. ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WATNICK KENNETH