This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/13/2023 at 00:17:23 (UTC).

WELL BUILT CONSTRUCTION & RENOVATIONS LLC VS JEIMECE WARE, AN INDIVIDUAL

Case Summary

On 02/22/2023 WELL BUILT CONSTRUCTION RENOVATIONS LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JEIMECE WARE, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0350

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELL BUILT CONSTRUCTION & RENOVATIONS LLC

Defendant

WARE AN INDIVIDUAL JEIMECE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GABA RODOLFO JR

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/22/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/22/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/22/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

2/22/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/22/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

2/22/2023: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2023
  • Hearing08/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department E at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • Hearing06/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department E at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Well Built Construction & Renovations LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Jeimece Ware, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Well Built Construction & Renovations LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Jeimece Ware, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Well Built Construction & Renovations LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Jeimece Ware, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 08/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. David A. Rosen in Department E Glendale Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less