This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/24/2021 at 17:18:12 (UTC).

WEINREB HOLDINGS, LP VS AUDIO EYES, LLC, A SUSPENDED CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/30/2021 WEINREB HOLDINGS, LP filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against AUDIO EYES, LLC, A SUSPENDED CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0661

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WEINREB HOLDINGS LP

Defendants

AUDIO EYES LLC A SUSPENDED CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

BOGGS AMBER DBA AUDIO EYES

BOGGS RICKEY JAY DBA AUDIO EYES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

ENDLER JEFFREY BRAD

MARINACCIO ANTHONY

 

Court Documents

Answer

9/21/2021: Answer

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/30/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Complaint

8/30/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/30/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/30/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - SUPPLEMENTAL COVER SHEET AND ALLEGATIONS FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT

8/30/2021: Unknown - SUPPLEMENTAL COVER SHEET AND ALLEGATIONS FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (AUDIO EYES, LLC, A SUSPENDED CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY)

8/31/2021: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (AUDIO EYES, LLC, A SUSPENDED CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (RICKEY JAY BOGGS)

8/31/2021: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (RICKEY JAY BOGGS)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (AMBER BOGGS)

8/31/2021: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (AMBER BOGGS)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

8/31/2021: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2021
  • Hearing10/28/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department F49 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Rickey Jay Boggs (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Amber Boggs)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Rickey Jay Boggs)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Audio Eyes, LLC, a suspended California limited liability company)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Weinreb Holdings, LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketSupplemental Cover Sheet and Allegations for Unlawful Detainer - Complaint; Filed by Weinreb Holdings, LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Weinreb Holdings, LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Weinreb Holdings, LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WEINREB HOLDINGS LP is a litigant