This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/17/2021 at 20:20:27 (UTC).

WEIKUN WENG VS ZIHAN GAO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/01/2021 WEIKUN WENG filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ZIHAN GAO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERESA A. BEAUDET. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2282

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERESA A. BEAUDET

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WENG WEIKUN

Defendants

GAO ZIHAN AKA ANNA GAO

AMERICAN COLLEGE OF FORENSIC STUDIES

GLOBAL EDUCATION RESOURCE CENTER INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ARNOLD WAYNE

BOBAK MARTIN

Defendant Attorney

PURITSKY ERIC

 

Court Documents

Case Management Order

10/26/2021: Case Management Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10); CAS...)

10/26/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10); CAS...)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/28/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

10/13/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/23/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Proof of Service by Mail

8/19/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Case Management Statement

8/19/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

8/19/2021: Case Management Statement

Proof of Personal Service

7/7/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING OR MOTING PARTY REGARDING MEET AND CONFER

8/2/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING OR MOTING PARTY REGARDING MEET AND CONFER

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING OR MOVING PARTY REGARDING MEET AND CONFER

8/2/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING OR MOVING PARTY REGARDING MEET AND CONFER

Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

8/2/2021: Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

8/2/2021: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/27/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/27/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/5/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/1/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/1/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2023
  • Hearing01/25/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • Hearing01/13/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • Hearing01/06/2023 at 4:00 PM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • Hearing08/23/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Zihan Gao (Defendant); Global Education Resource Center, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketMotion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by Zihan Gao (Defendant); Global Education Resource Center, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Demurring or Moting Party Regarding Meet and Confer); Filed by Zihan Gao (Defendant); Global Education Resource Center, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Weikun Weng (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Weikun Weng (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Weikun Weng (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Weikun Weng (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Weikun Weng (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Weikun Weng (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN COLLEGE OF FORENSIC STUDIES is a litigant