This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2021 at 20:31:37 (UTC).

WEBER ENTERPRISE TRUCKING CORPORATION VS FOREST LAWN MEMORIAL-PARK ASSOCIATION

Case Summary

On 05/13/2021 WEBER ENTERPRISE TRUCKING CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FOREST LAWN MEMORIAL-PARK ASSOCIATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MEL RED RECANA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7999

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MEL RED RECANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

WEBER ENTERPRISE TRUCKING CORPORATION

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

FOREST LAWN MEMORIAL-PARK ASSOCIATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

KOLBER RICHARD A.

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

QUIGLEY EDWARD FRANCIS

PADILLA JOSE L

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/13/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/13/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/13/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/2/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/7/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Cross-Complaint

7/13/2021: Cross-Complaint

Answer

7/13/2021: Answer

Notice of Related Case

7/22/2021: Notice of Related Case

Answer

8/16/2021: Answer

Case Management Statement

9/23/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/23/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES WEBER ENTERPRISE TRUCKING CORPORATION

9/22/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES WEBER ENTERPRISE TRUCKING CORPORATION

Case Management Statement

9/22/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE OF HEARING RE RELATED CASE; NOTICE OF TRIAL, FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE, AND MEDIATION COMPLETION DATE

10/8/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF HEARING RE RELATED CASE; NOTICE OF TRIAL, FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE, AND MEDIATION COMPLETION DATE

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2023
  • Hearing06/05/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 45 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • Hearing05/26/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 45 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • Hearing05/26/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 45 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • Hearing11/23/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 45 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 45, Mel Red Recana, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketNotice (OF HEARING RE RELATED CASE; NOTICE OF TRIAL, FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE, AND MEDIATION COMPLETION DATE); Filed by WEBER ENTERPRISE TRUCKING CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by FOREST LAWN MEMORIAL-PARK ASSOCIATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by FOREST LAWN MEMORIAL-PARK ASSOCIATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees (Weber Enterprise Trucking Corporation); Filed by WEBER ENTERPRISE TRUCKING CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by WEBER ENTERPRISE TRUCKING CORPORATION (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by FOREST LAWN MEMORIAL-PARK ASSOCIATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by FOREST LAWN MEMORIAL-PARK ASSOCIATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by FOREST LAWN MEMORIAL-PARK ASSOCIATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by WEBER ENTERPRISE TRUCKING CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by WEBER ENTERPRISE TRUCKING CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by WEBER ENTERPRISE TRUCKING CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by WEBER ENTERPRISE TRUCKING CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WEBER ENTERPRISE TRUCKING CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where FOREST LAWN MEMORIAL-PARK ASSOCIATION AKA FOREST LAWN MEMORIAL PARK MORTUARY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RICHARD A.KOLBER ESQ.