This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/04/2022 at 00:17:43 (UTC).

WEBER & ASSOCIATES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS JOSE DE JESUS ROBLES

Case Summary

On 12/10/2021 WEBER ASSOCIATES, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JOSE DE JESUS ROBLES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA A. MEIERS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5137

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA A. MEIERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WEBER & ASSOCIATES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendant

ROBLES JOSE DE JESUS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLUM HOWARD S

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/10/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/10/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/10/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/10/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice: Waiver of Court Fees (Superior Court)

4/8/2022: Notice: Waiver of Court Fees (Superior Court)

Answer

3/29/2022: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

3/24/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE]

1/13/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE]

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/13/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/28/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Case Management Statement

4/28/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

4/25/2022: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/22/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 06/08/2022

6/8/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 06/08/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/8/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2022
  • Hearing08/03/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 12 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 06/08/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketNotice (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by WEBER & ASSOCIATES, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by WEBER & ASSOCIATES, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by WEBER & ASSOCIATES, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketNotice: Waiver of Court Fees (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Jose De Jesus Robles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by WEBER & ASSOCIATES, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Case Management Conference]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by WEBER & ASSOCIATES, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by WEBER & ASSOCIATES, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by WEBER & ASSOCIATES, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Weber and Associates Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BLUM HOWARD S.