This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/21/2022 at 22:02:11 (UTC).

WEBER & ASSOCIATES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS ERIK ZEPEDA CASTANEDA

Case Summary

On 12/10/2021 WEBER ASSOCIATES, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ERIK ZEPEDA CASTANEDA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ARMEN TAMZARIAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5076

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ARMEN TAMZARIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WEBER & ASSOCIATES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendant

ZEPEDA CASTANEDA ERIK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLUM HOWARD S

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/10/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/10/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/10/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/10/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4/8/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

3/22/2022: Case Management Statement

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/14/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/6/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/29/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

7/18/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2022
  • Hearing08/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 52 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Re Sanctions for failure to submit default packet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • Hearing08/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 52 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52, Armen Tamzarian, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Default Judgment) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Default Judgment)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52, Armen Tamzarian, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by WEBER & ASSOCIATES, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by WEBER & ASSOCIATES, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by WEBER & ASSOCIATES, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by WEBER & ASSOCIATES, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by WEBER & ASSOCIATES, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by WEBER & ASSOCIATES, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******5076 Hearing Date: July 18, 2022 Dept: 52

Tentative Ruling

Order to Show Cause Re: Default Judgment

California Rules of Court, rule 3.110(h) provides:

When a default is entered, the party who requested the entry of default must obtain a default judgment against the defaulting party within 45 days after the default was entered, unless the court has granted an extension of time. The court may issue an order to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed if that party fails to obtain entry of judgment against a defaulting party or to request an extension of time to apply for a default judgment within that time.

Defendant Erik Zepeda Castaneda’s default was entered on February 14, 2022. More than 45 days have passed. Since then, plaintiff has filed nothing other than its case management statement on March 22, 2022. Plaintiff has not filed an application for default judgment or requested an extension of time to do so.

The court hereby sets an order to show cause re: sanctions under rule 3.110(h) for August 29, 2022, at 8:30 a.m.

The default prove up hearing is hereby continued to August 29, 2022, at 8:30 a.m.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Weber and Associates Inc is a litigant