This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/28/2022 at 07:05:41 (UTC).

WEBCOR CONSTRUCTION L.P., A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP VS NEW CENTURY PARTNERS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/27/2021 WEBCOR CONSTRUCTION L P , A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NEW CENTURY PARTNERS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CRAIG D. KARLAN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1436

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CRAIG D. KARLAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WEBCOR CONSTRUCTION L.P. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Defendant

NEW CENTURY PARTNERS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEE BENNETT J.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/27/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/27/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/27/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/27/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/27/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Request for Dismissal

2/9/2022: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Webcor Construction L.P., a California Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Webcor Construction L.P., a California Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Webcor Construction L.P., a California Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Webcor Construction L.P., a California Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NEW CENTURY PARTNERS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where WEBCOR CONSTRUCTION LP DBA WEBCOR BUILDERS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEE, BENNETT J.