This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/15/2021 at 04:22:47 (UTC).

WB BLVD, LLC VS PACIFIC LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/30/2021 WB BLVD, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against PACIFIC LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0165

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Burbank Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WB BLVD LLC

Respondent

PACIFIC LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

YASSIN OMAR J.

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

7/13/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] APPROVING TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS

7/13/2021: Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] APPROVING TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SE...)

7/2/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SE...)

Notice of Hearing on Petition

5/25/2021: Notice of Hearing on Petition

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/01/2021

6/1/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/01/2021

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION FOR AN ORDER APPROVING PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS

6/4/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION FOR AN ORDER APPROVING PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/30/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Petition - PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS

4/30/2021: Petition - PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Judgment or Order); Filed by WB BLVD, LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketOrder ([PROPOSED] APPROVING TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS); Filed by WB BLVD, LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department B; Hearing on Petition (for Approval of Transfer of Structured Settlement Payment Rights) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Petition for Approval of Transfer of Structured Se...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department B; Hearing on Petition (for Approval of Transfer of Structured Settlement Payment Rights) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketNotice (OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION FOR AN ORDER APPROVING PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS); Filed by WB BLVD, LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • Docketat 3:22 PM in Department B; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 06/01/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by WB BLVD, LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by WB BLVD, LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketPetition (FOR APPROVAL OF TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS); Filed by WB BLVD, LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pacific Life Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer YASSIN OMAR JAMAL