Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/07/2019 at 01:30:42 (UTC).

WAYNE DISTRIBUTION CENTER ET AL VS 3179 LOS FELIZ PARTNERS L

Case Summary

On 01/24/2018 WAYNE DISTRIBUTION CENTER filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against 3179 LOS FELIZ PARTNERS L. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GREGORY W. ALARCON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1121

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GREGORY W. ALARCON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

WAYNE DISTRIBUTION CENTER

PREMIER MEAT COMPANY

Defendants and Respondents

3179 LOS FELIZ PARTNERS LLC

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

KAGIANARIS ALEX

MORRISON LA

KAGIANARIS ALEXANDROS

THE MORRISON

MORRISON THE

LA MORRISON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF GARY S. SHERMAN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

5/25/2018: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

9/7/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

Legacy Document

10/3/2018: Legacy Document

Judgment

10/3/2018: Judgment

Minute Order

10/3/2018: Minute Order

Request for Dismissal

10/3/2018: Request for Dismissal

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

10/24/2018: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

5/8/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

NOTICE OF RULING AND NOTICE OF FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATE

6/1/2018: NOTICE OF RULING AND NOTICE OF FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATE

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/26/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/12/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

2/15/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

2/15/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

SUMMONS

1/24/2018: SUMMONS

UNLIMITED CIVIL ACTION COMPLATNT FOR MONEY DEMAND: $62,945.03 1. GOODS SOLD AND DELIVERED;ETC

1/24/2018: UNLIMITED CIVIL ACTION COMPLATNT FOR MONEY DEMAND: $62,945.03 1. GOODS SOLD AND DELIVERED;ETC

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2019
  • at 08:33 AM in Department 36, Gregory W. Alarcon, Presiding; Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • at 08:32 AM in Department 36, Gregory W. Alarcon, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • Writ of Execution ((Los Angeles)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by Wayne Distribution Center (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 36; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-10-03 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • Judgment; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • Declaration; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 03/12/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Wayne Distribution Center (Plaintiff); Premier Meat Company (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • UNLIMITED CIVIL ACTION COMPLATNT FOR MONEY DEMAND: $62,945.03 1. GOODS SOLD AND DELIVERED;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Wayne Distribution Center (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Morrison is a litigant

Latest cases where PREMIER MEAT COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where WAYNE DISTRIBUTION CENTER A CORPORATION DBA PREMIER MEAT COMPANY is a litigant