Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/27/2019 at 07:22:17 (UTC).

WAYNE BRENT ET AL VS FAIROOZ KABBINAVAR ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/24/2018 WAYNE BRENT filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against FAIROOZ KABBINAVAR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1142

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

BRENT WAYNE BY AND THROUGH HIS SURVIVING

BRENT NAKILA K.

Defendants and Respondents

KABBINAVAR FAIROOZ M.D.

KIM CHINSUK NP

REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA

DOES 1 TO 200

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

BRENT NAJILA K.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

1/24/2018: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

1/24/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Brent, Wayne by and through his surviving (Plaintiff); Nakila K. Brent (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC691142    Hearing Date: July 07, 2020    Dept: 58

Judge John P. Doyle

Department 58


Hearing Date: July 7, 2020

Case Name: Brent, et al. v. Kabbinavar, et al.

Case No.: BC691142

Matter: Motion to Extend Page Limitation

Moving Party: Defendants Fairooz Kabbinavar, M.D., Chinsuk Kim, N.P., Jenny J. Kim,

M.D., Regents of the University of California, and Manuel Eskildsen, M.D.

Responding Party: Plaintiff Wayne Brent by and through his surviving spouse and successor

in interest Najila K. Brent


Tentative Ruling:      The Motion is granted in part.


Defendants Fairooz Kabbinavar, M.D., Chinsuk Kim, N.P., Jenny J. Kim, M.D., Regents of the University of California, and Manuel Eskildsen, M.D. seek leave to file a demurrer in excess of 15 pages.  Specifically, Defendants seek to file a 55-page demurrer because the Complaint alleges 30 causes of action. 

Plaintiff agrees to a 10-page extension and argues nothing more is necessary.

The Motion is granted in part.  The Court is inclined to allow a 30-page demurrer.  While the Complaint might have a laundry list of approximately thirty causes of action, it actually appears to focus on intentional tort, fraud, and negligence labeled as thirteen causes of action.  In this regard, the parties are strongly encouraged to meet and confer prior to the filing of a
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA A PUBLIC ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRENT NAJILA K. LAW OFFICES OF