Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/25/2021 at 03:46:14 (UTC).

WAWANESA GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY VS GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/14/2021 WAWANESA GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0509

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WAWANESA GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAMS JASON

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

4/19/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/15/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/14/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/14/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/14/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/14/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2021
  • Hearing08/12/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department U at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Wawanesa General Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Wawanesa General Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Wawanesa General Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Wawanesa General Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WAWANESA GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where General Electric International Operations Company, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILLIAMS JASON