This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/30/2022 at 15:33:30 (UTC).

WATKINS FAMILY TRUST OF 1990 DATED SEPTEMBER 12, 1990

Case Summary

On 05/25/2021 WATKINS FAMILY TRUST OF 1990 DATED SEPTEMBER 12, 1990 was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROSENBLOOM, JONATHAN L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5122

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROSENBLOOM, JONATHAN L

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WATKINS JARED ANDREW

Not Classified By Court

WATKINS FAMILY TRUST OF 1990

Other

KRAMER ERIK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BYRNE JOHN MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing

6/17/2022: Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing

Minute Order

6/14/2022: Minute Order

Supplement - to Petition for Approval of Second Trust Accounting

5/17/2022: Supplement - to Petition for Approval of Second Trust Accounting

Declaration

12/3/2021: Declaration

Supplement - to Petition of Trustee Jared Andrew Watkins for Approval of Trust Accounting

12/3/2021: Supplement - to Petition of Trustee Jared Andrew Watkins for Approval of Trust Accounting

Proof of Service

12/3/2021: Proof of Service

Minute Order

2/17/2022: Minute Order

Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Subsequent) - Petition for Approval of Second Trust Accounting

4/1/2022: Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Subsequent) - Petition for Approval of Second Trust Accounting

Notice - Hearing

4/5/2022: Notice - Hearing

Order - Approving Account

4/6/2022: Order - Approving Account

Response - Response to Declaration and Objection of Beneficiary William Erik Kramer to Petition of Trustee Jared Andrew Watkins for Approval of Trust Accounting

12/9/2021: Response - Response to Declaration and Objection of Beneficiary William Erik Kramer to Petition of Trustee Jared Andrew Watkins for Approval of Trust Accounting

Minute Order

12/14/2021: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing

10/15/2021: Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing

Minute Order

10/14/2021: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing

9/16/2021: Notice - Hearing

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2022
  • Hearing08/19/2022 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 79 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trust 17200 Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketNotice - Hearing (Notice of Hearing ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • Docketin Probate Department 79, Rosenbloom, Jonathan L, Presiding; Trust 17200 Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketSupplement (to Petition for Approval of Second Trust Accounting ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketOrder - Approving Account

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketNotice - Hearing; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketPetition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Subsequent) (Petition for Approval of Second Trust Accounting ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Beneficiary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketSupplement (to Petition of Trustee Jared Andrew Watkins for Approval of Trust Accounting ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Beneficiary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing (Notice of Hearing ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 79, Rosenbloom, Jonathan L, Presiding; Trust 17200 Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketPetition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) (Petition of Trustee Jared Andrew Watkins for Approval of Trust Accounting ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BYRNE JOHN MICHAEL