This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/07/2021 at 10:21:55 (UTC).

WATERS, JASMINE DENISE - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 07/27/2020 WATERS, JASMINE DENISE - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KLEIN, CLIFFORD, BARRY, WILLIAM, PRIVER, MARK S., MATCHAM, SUSAN J. and SIMPSON, C. EDWARD. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5950

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

KLEIN, CLIFFORD

BARRY, WILLIAM

PRIVER, MARK S.

MATCHAM, SUSAN J.

SIMPSON, C. EDWARD

 

Party Details

Petitioner

THREATS JEAN

Decedent

WATERS JASMINE DENISE

Other

WATERS JOSEPH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BRONSHTEYN YASHA

Other Attorney

FELDMAN STEPHEN MARK

 

Court Documents

Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

7/27/2020: Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

7/27/2020: Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate - Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

8/10/2020: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate - Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

Proof of Publication

8/14/2020: Proof of Publication

Minute Order

12/14/2020: Minute Order

Objection - Appointment of Personal Representative

12/10/2020: Objection - Appointment of Personal Representative

Minute Order

4/5/2021: Minute Order

Declaration - Declaration of Stephen M. Feldman Re Status

4/1/2021: Declaration - Declaration of Stephen M. Feldman Re Status

Ex Parte - Petition ($200.00) - (Drop Off On 05/03/2021). Special Letters Without General Powers.

4/30/2021: Ex Parte - Petition ($200.00) - (Drop Off On 05/03/2021). Special Letters Without General Powers.

Order - Appointing Special Administrator

5/7/2021: Order - Appointing Special Administrator

Declaration - Declaration re Notice of Ex Parte

5/6/2021: Declaration - Declaration re Notice of Ex Parte

Ex Parte - Petition ($200.00) - 05/07/2021-Ex Parte for Special Administration w/o general power

5/6/2021: Ex Parte - Petition ($200.00) - 05/07/2021-Ex Parte for Special Administration w/o general power

Minute Order

5/5/2021: Minute Order

Ex Parte - Order - DWOP

5/3/2021: Ex Parte - Order - DWOP

Letters - Special Administrator

5/26/2021: Letters - Special Administrator

Probate Minute Order - Probate Master Minute Order

6/15/2021: Probate Minute Order - Probate Master Minute Order

Minute Order

8/18/2021: Minute Order

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid; Filed by Objector

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 9, Simpson, C. Edward, Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketDISP: Denied-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketPetition Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Objector

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid; Filed by Objector

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid; Filed by Objector

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Objector

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Objector

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketObjection - Appointment of Personal Representative; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketProof of Publication; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate (Notice of Petition to Administer Estate ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketPetition - Letters of Administration (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities - Personal Representative; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FELDMAN STEPHEN MARK