Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/09/2021 at 18:37:49 (UTC).

WASHINGTON, LISSA MICHELE VS MCCONNELL, JOYCE PRICE

Case Summary

On 02/18/2021 WASHINGTON, LISSA MICHELE filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against MCCONNELL, JOYCE PRICE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SWIFT, DAVID W.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0822

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SWIFT, DAVID W.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WASHINGTON LISSA MICHELE

Respondent

MCCONNELL JOYCE PRICE

 

Court Documents

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

4/5/2021: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Minute Order

4/27/2021: Minute Order

Minute Order

4/5/2021: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

3/11/2021: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Minute Order

3/11/2021: Minute Order

Petition - Civil Harassment

2/18/2021: Petition - Civil Harassment

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109) - Denied

2/18/2021: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109) - Denied

Civil Case Cover Sheet - And Addendum

2/18/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - And Addendum

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 25, Swift, David W., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Dismissed - TRO-Lack of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 25, Swift, David W., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Not Held - Continued by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 25, Swift, David W., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Not Held - Continued by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (And Addendum )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109) (Denied ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketPetition - Civil Harassment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less