Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/13/2021 at 08:04:59 (UTC).

WARD, OSHANNA VS ROBOTTOM, JIMMENESS

Case Summary

On 01/21/2021 WARD, OSHANNA filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against ROBOTTOM, JIMMENESS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TITUS, PATRICIA J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0070

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TITUS, PATRICIA J

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WARD OSHANNA

Respondent

ROBOTTOM JIMMENESS

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

2/16/2021: Minute Order

Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130)

2/16/2021: Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130)

Proof of Service - Personal Service on 1/25/2021 at 7:50AM

1/25/2021: Proof of Service - Personal Service on 1/25/2021 at 7:50AM

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - GRANTED

1/21/2021: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - GRANTED

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

1/21/2021: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

1/21/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Request - DV Prevention w/ Minor Child (Case Initiation)

1/21/2021: Request - DV Prevention w/ Minor Child (Case Initiation)

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given)

1/21/2021: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 6, Titus, Patricia J, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Granted - RO After Evidence by both

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketRestraining Order After Hearing (Form 130); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (Personal Service on 1/25/2021 at 7:50AM ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110) (GRANTED ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/ Minor Child (Case Initiation); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less