Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/07/2021 at 16:49:41 (UTC).

WANG, WEI VS CIOARA, FLORIN AWEL

Case Summary

On 01/12/2021 WANG, WEI filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against CIOARA, FLORIN AWEL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARTELLA, TIMOTHY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0034

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARTELLA, TIMOTHY

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WANG WEI

Respondent

CIOARA FLORIN AWEL

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

2/4/2021: Minute Order

Proof of Service

1/25/2021: Proof of Service

Petition - Civil Harassment

1/12/2021: Petition - Civil Harassment

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109) - Denied

1/13/2021: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109) - Denied

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department S, Martella, Timothy, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Denied - RO- After Evidence by both

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109) (Denied ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketPetition - Civil Harassment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less