This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/06/2022 at 20:06:08 (UTC).

WANG ANESTHESIA NURSING MANAGEMENT, INC. VS GRAND AVENUE SURGERY CENTER, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/11/2022 WANG ANESTHESIA NURSING MANAGEMENT, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GRAND AVENUE SURGERY CENTER, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MALCOLM MACKEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2288

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MALCOLM MACKEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WANG ANESTHESIA NURSING MANAGEMENT INC.

Defendants

DIGNITY HEALTH

GRAND AVENUE SURGERY CENTER LLC

HEALTHPOINT SURGERY CENTER MANAGEMENT LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LENSKY ARTHUR L.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

7/11/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

7/11/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

7/11/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/11/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/11/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/11/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

7/11/2022: Complaint

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE FILED BY PLAINTIFF AGAIN...) OF 07/14/2022

7/14/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE FILED BY PLAINTIFF AGAIN...) OF 07/14/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE FILED BY PLAINTIFF AGAIN...)

7/14/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE FILED BY PLAINTIFF AGAIN...)

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

7/13/2022: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/2/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

7/28/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/28/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/28/2022: Proof of Personal Service

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2022
  • Hearing11/10/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 34 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Wang Anesthesia Nursing Management, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Wang Anesthesia Nursing Management, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Wang Anesthesia Nursing Management, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • Docketat 3:10 PM in Department 55, Malcolm Mackey, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE FILED BY PLAINTIFF AGAIN...) of 07/14/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE FILED BY PLAINTIFF AGAIN...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Wang Anesthesia Nursing Management, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Wang Anesthesia Nursing Management, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Wang Anesthesia Nursing Management, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Wang Anesthesia Nursing Management, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DIGNITY HEALTH DBA NORTHRIDGE HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LENSKY ARTHUR