This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/11/2023 at 11:34:26 (UTC).

WANDER, SHIRLEY CYD - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 10/05/2022 WANDER, SHIRLEY CYD - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ROSENBLOOM, JONATHAN L and SCADUTO, LYNN H.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9929

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ROSENBLOOM, JONATHAN L

SCADUTO, LYNN H.

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Respondent

ROGES JUDY

Decedent

WANDER SHIRLEY CYD

Others

WALTER DAVID

WALTER MARCI

WALTER MARK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BRYNE CALVIN P.

Respondent Attorney

MACFARLANE LAURA GRACE

Other Attorney

KINCHELOE JUSTIN MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

8/29/2023: Minute Order

Minute Order

8/29/2023: Minute Order

Notice - Continuance - 08/29

8/25/2023: Notice - Continuance - 08/29

Minute Order

6/6/2023: Minute Order

Minute Order

6/6/2023: Minute Order

Report (No Fee) - Joint Status Report

5/23/2023: Report (No Fee) - Joint Status Report

Minute Order

3/17/2023: Minute Order

Minute Order

3/17/2023: Minute Order

Report (No Fee) - Joint Status Report

3/6/2023: Report (No Fee) - Joint Status Report

Objection - Objection to Will Contest

2/9/2023: Objection - Objection to Will Contest

Minute Order

12/13/2022: Minute Order

Minute Order

12/13/2022: Minute Order

Notice - Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

12/8/2022: Notice - Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice - Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

12/6/2022: Notice - Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Minute Order

11/9/2022: Minute Order

Summons - issued

11/7/2022: Summons - issued

Summons - issued

11/7/2022: Summons - issued

Contest of Will

11/3/2022: Contest of Will

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2023
  • Hearing11/20/2023 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 79 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2023
  • Hearing11/20/2023 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 79 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Contest of Will Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2023
  • Docketin Probate Department 79, Scaduto, Lynn H., Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2023
  • Docketin Probate Department 79, Scaduto, Lynn H., Presiding; Contest of Will Hearing - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2023
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2023
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2023
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Objector

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2023
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Objector

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2023
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Objector

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2023
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Decedent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
67 More Docket Entries
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketContest of Will; Filed by Objector

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketWill Deposited (5 Pgs - 12/23/2021 ); Filed by Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketSupplement (Verified Supplement to Petition for Letters Testamentary ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketProof of Publication; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate (Notice of Petition to Administer Estate ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketPetition - Probate of Will (Initial); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketAffidavit; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities - Personal Representative; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less