Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/20/2019 at 02:05:46 (UTC).

WANDA RICHARDSON ET AL VS HESMER GONZALEZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/18/2017 WANDA RICHARDSON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HESMER GONZALEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTOPHER K. LUI. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0390

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

RICHARDSON WANDA

RICHARDSON LARRY

Defendants and Respondents

GONZALEZ HESMER

MERIDA DISENIA BAMACA

DOES 1 TO 20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LISHYK DZMITRY

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

3/29/2019: Request for Dismissal

SUMMONS

10/18/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

10/18/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by WANDA RICHARDSON (Plaintiff); LARRY RICHARDSON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by WANDA RICHARDSON (Plaintiff); LARRY RICHARDSON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LISHYK DZMITRY