This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/05/2019 at 01:35:49 (UTC).

WALTON LAW GROUP PC VS DUTCH HARBOUR FINANCIAL LTD ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/08/2018 WALTON LAW GROUP PC filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against DUTCH HARBOUR FINANCIAL LTD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GREGORY W. ALARCON, MICHAEL L. STERN and SAMANTHA JESSNER. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3492

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GREGORY W. ALARCON

MICHAEL L. STERN

SAMANTHA JESSNER

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

WALTON LAW GROUP PC

WALTON LAW GROUP P.C.

Defendants and Respondents

DUTCH HARBOUR FINANCIAL LTD

LEPPO DAVID GREG

DOES 1 TO 50

GREGG DAVID

HINDS & SHANKMAN LLP

GFY LLC

DAMASHEK EVAN

DUTCH HARBOUR FINANCIAL LTD.

MCKENNON SCHINDLER LLP

DCDM LAW GROUP P.C.

TRIPHARMA LLC

Not Classified By Court

TRIPHARMA LLC AND EVAN DAMESHEK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

WALTON JOHN R. ESQ.

WALTON JOHN RICHARDSON

PARKER DAVID BRUCE

Defendant Attorneys

SINGHAL DHEERAJ KUMAR

WINTHROP REID ADAM

HINDS JAMES ANDREW JR

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

5/2/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CIVIL DEPOSIT

5/2/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

PLAINTIFF WALTON LAW GROUP, P.C.'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

5/2/2018: PLAINTIFF WALTON LAW GROUP, P.C.'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

SUMMONS

7/6/2018: SUMMONS

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1) DECLARATORY RELIEF, ETC

7/6/2018: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1) DECLARATORY RELIEF, ETC

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

7/9/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

Minute Order

7/16/2018: Minute Order

ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

7/16/2018: ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

7/19/2018: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

NOTICE OF RULING RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND FILING OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

7/25/2018: NOTICE OF RULING RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND FILING OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/26/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order

8/1/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

8/6/2018: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

NOTICE OF ORDER RE RELATED CASES

8/7/2018: NOTICE OF ORDER RE RELATED CASES

Minute Order

8/16/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF ORDER RE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE FILED BY DCDM LAW GROUP, PC

8/22/2018: NOTICE OF ORDER RE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE FILED BY DCDM LAW GROUP, PC

NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL

8/23/2018: NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL

Minute Order

8/31/2018: Minute Order

84 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Sever - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Sever - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Sever - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department ; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Demurrer - without Mot...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketMotion for Stay of Proceedings; Filed by Walton Law Group P.C. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
142 More Docket Entries
  • 03/14/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Walton Law Group PC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1) TORTIOUS INTERFERENCE WITH PROSPECTEVE ECONOMIC ADVANTAGE ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Walton Law Group PC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Tripharma LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where DCDM LAW GROUP PC is a litigant

Latest cases where Hinds & Shankman, LLP is a litigant