This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/26/2019 at 03:18:22 (UTC).

WALTERS WHOLESALE ELECTRIC CO VS SAFEWAY BUILDING SYSTEMS

Case Summary

On 03/19/2018 WALTERS WHOLESALE ELECTRIC CO filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against SAFEWAY BUILDING SYSTEMS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAN THOMAS OKI. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0130

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAN THOMAS OKI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WALTERS WHOLESALE ELECTRIC CO

Defendants

OAK PARK MANOR LP

TOVEY SHULTZ CONSTRUCTION INC

SAFEWAY BUILIDING SYSTEMS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VITA JOHN C.

Defendant Attorneys

KREIS JOHN P. ESQ.

PITRE RANDALL J. LAW OFFICES OF

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

12/13/2018: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

02/08/2019

Docketat 08:30 AM in Department J, Dan Thomas Oki, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/13/2018

DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by WALTERS WHOLESALE ELECTRIC CO (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2018

Docketat 08:30 AM in Department J; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) -

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2018

DocketMinute order entered: 2018-09-28 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2018

Docketat 08:30 AM in Department J; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Advanced to a Previous Date) -

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/03/2018

Docketat 08:30 AM in Department J; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2018

Docketat 08:30 AM in Department J; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) -

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2018

DocketMinute order entered: 2018-07-02 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2018

DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by TOVEY SHULTZ CONSTRUCTION INC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2018

Docketat 08:30 AM in Department J; Court Order - Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
05/03/2018

DocketGeneral Denial; Filed by OAK PARK MANOR LP (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/02/2018

DocketAnswer; Filed by TOVEY SHULTZ CONSTRUCTION INC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/02/2018

DocketNotice; Filed by TOVEY SHULTZ CONSTRUCTION INC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2018

DocketDefault Entered; Filed by WALTERS WHOLESALE ELECTRIC CO (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/16/2018

DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by WALTERS WHOLESALE ELECTRIC CO (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/16/2018

DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by WALTERS WHOLESALE ELECTRIC CO (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/16/2018

DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by WALTERS WHOLESALE ELECTRIC CO (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2018

DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2018

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/19/2018

DocketComplaint; Filed by WALTERS WHOLESALE ELECTRIC CO (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less