Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/23/2020 at 17:00:59 (UTC).

WALTERINA RAMIREZ VS PARC TARZANA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/07/2020 WALTERINA RAMIREZ filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PARC TARZANA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5339

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAMIREZ WALTERINA

Defendants

PARC HATTERAS

BELL PROPERTY MANAGEMENT SERVICES

PARC TARZANA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KARPEL DONALD E.

 

Court Documents

PI General Order

7/22/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

7/22/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/7/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/7/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/7/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

7/7/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Complaint

7/7/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2023
  • Hearing07/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • Hearing01/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • Hearing12/21/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Walterina Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Walterina Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Walterina Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KARPEL DONALD E. ESQ.