This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/09/2021 at 04:46:40 (UTC).

WALTER PADILLA VS VAHE MARDIGIAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/28/2021 WALTER PADILLA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against VAHE MARDIGIAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7680

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PADILLA WALTER

Defendants

MARDIGIAN ALICE

MARDIGIAN VAHE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ZEESMAN ALEXANDER JOSHUA

ZEESMAN DIANA

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

8/6/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

8/6/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/28/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/28/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/28/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

7/28/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2024
  • Hearing07/24/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • Hearing01/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • Hearing01/11/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Walter Padilla (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Walter Padilla (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Walter Padilla (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZEESMAN DIANA