This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/22/2023 at 07:31:53 (UTC).

WALTER LORENTE VS J.P. MORGAN CHASE NATIONAL CORPORATE SERVICE, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/06/2022 WALTER LORENTE filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against J P MORGAN CHASE NATIONAL CORPORATE SERVICE, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2759

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LORENTE WALTER

Defendants

J.P. MORGAN CHASE

J.P. MORGAN CHASE NATIONAL CORPORATE SERVICE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GLOTZER JOSH W. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

10/6/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

10/6/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

10/6/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

10/6/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/6/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/6/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

10/6/2022: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2024
  • Hearing10/03/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2024
  • Hearing04/04/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2024
  • Hearing03/21/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Walter Lorente (Plaintiff); As to: J.P. Morgan Chase National Corporate Service, Inc. (Defendant); J.P. Morgan Chase (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Walter Lorente (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. William A. Crowfoot in Department 27 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Walter Lorente (Plaintiff); As to: J.P. Morgan Chase National Corporate Service, Inc. (Defendant); J.P. Morgan Chase (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 03/21/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/04/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 10/03/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less