This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/05/2019 at 01:42:24 (UTC).

WALTER LANCASTER VS BEATS ELECTRONICS LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/22/2017 WALTER LANCASTER filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against BEATS ELECTRONICS LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CAROLYN B. KUHL and DENNIS J. LANDIN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7998

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

CAROLYN B. KUHL

DENNIS J. LANDIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LANCASTER WALTER

Defendants and Respondents

BEATS ELECTRONICS LLC

BOULDIN SEAN

LOVENE JIMMY

DR. DRE

APPLE CORPORATION INC.

YOUNG AMBER

DOES 1 THROUGH 500

IOVENE JIMMY

YOUNG ANDRE

DOES 1 THROUGH 500 INCLUSIVE

FOERSTER MORRISTON

WALSH DAVID M.

Not Classified By Court

WALTER LANCASTER PLAINTIFF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

STANLEY-GILES ANDREW CHRISTOPHER

MORRISON & FOERSTER LLP

SEM REBECCA HARRISON

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

2/5/2018: SUMMONS

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

2/5/2018: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

PROOF OF SERVICE

2/5/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

2/5/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE

2/5/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE

Proof of Service

2/26/2018: Proof of Service

Proof of Service

2/26/2018: Proof of Service

DEFENDANTS BEATS ELECTRONICS, LLC?S AND APPLE INC.'S ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

3/19/2018: DEFENDANTS BEATS ELECTRONICS, LLC?S AND APPLE INC.'S ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

DECLARATION OF WENDY J. RAY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS BEATS ELECTONICS, LLC AND APPLE INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 425.16

3/19/2018: DECLARATION OF WENDY J. RAY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS BEATS ELECTONICS, LLC AND APPLE INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 425.16

Minute Order

3/23/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

3/23/2018: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

PROOF OF SERVICE

3/23/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF CONTINUED STATUS CONFERENCE

3/23/2018: NOTICE OF CONTINUED STATUS CONFERENCE

Minute Order

4/5/2018: Minute Order

PLAINTIFFS OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT'S BEATS ELECTRONICS, LLC AND APPLE INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE

4/18/2018: PLAINTIFFS OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT'S BEATS ELECTRONICS, LLC AND APPLE INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE

PLAINTIFFS EXHIBIT LIST IN SUPPORT OF OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT'S BEATS ELECTRONICS, LLC AND APPLE INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE

4/18/2018: PLAINTIFFS EXHIBIT LIST IN SUPPORT OF OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT'S BEATS ELECTRONICS, LLC AND APPLE INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE

DEFENDANTS BEATS ELECTONICS, LLC AND APPLE INC.'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 425.16

4/18/2018: DEFENDANTS BEATS ELECTONICS, LLC AND APPLE INC.'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 425.16

Unknown

4/18/2018: Unknown

90 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2019
  • Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by Walter Lancaster (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • Notice (of Court Orders); Filed by Apple Corporation, Inc. (Defendant); Beats Electronics, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Reconsideration (and in the Hybrid Petition for Rehearing per the Order of April 3, 2019;) - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Order (PREFILING ORDER-VEXATIOUS LITIGANT); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Order (Ruling Re Motion for Reconsideration); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Reconsideration and in the Hybrid Petit...) of 05/16/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Reconsideration and in the Hybrid Petit...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by Walter Lancaster (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
151 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2018
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • at 00:00 AM in Department 309; (Order-Complex Determination; Case Determined to be Complex) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Walter Lancaster (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • CAUSES OF ACTION 1. CIVIL CONSPIRACY ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Beats Electronics, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where DRE APC is a litigant

Latest cases where Apple Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sem, Rebecca Harrison