This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2021 at 15:22:29 (UTC).

WALTER CARROLL, AN INDIVIDUAL VS BROWN STRAUSS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 WALTER CARROLL, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BROWN STRAUSS, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL M. CROWLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4107

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL M. CROWLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WALTER CARROLL AN INDIVIDUAL

Defendants

ARCHIE LEE GARDNER III AN INDIVIDUAL

BROWN STRAUSS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOGAN WALTER J

Defendant Attorney

O'CONNOR EDWARD RICHARD

 

Court Documents

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

6/3/2021: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Notice of Change of Firm Name

6/8/2021: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Answer

3/25/2020: Answer

Answer

3/16/2020: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

2/7/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/7/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/31/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/31/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/31/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

1/31/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2023
  • Hearing01/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • Hearing07/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • Hearing06/29/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by BROWN STRAUSS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant); ARCHIE LEE GARDNER, III, AN INDIVIDUAL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by BROWN STRAUSS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant); ARCHIE LEE GARDNER, III, AN INDIVIDUAL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by ARCHIE LEE GARDNER, III, AN INDIVIDUAL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by BROWN STRAUSS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by WALTER CARROLL, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by WALTER CARROLL, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by WALTER CARROLL, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by WALTER CARROLL, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by WALTER CARROLL, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Brown Strauss, Inc., a Delaware Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOGAN, WALTER J