Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/22/2019 at 00:44:42 (UTC).

WALSH/SHEA CORRIDOR CONSTRUCTORS VS HNTB CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 05/18/2017 WALSH/SHEA CORRIDOR CONSTRUCTORS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HNTB CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ELIZABETH R. FEFFER, KENNETH R. FREEMAN, CAROLYN B. KUHL and AMY D. HOGUE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1648

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ELIZABETH R. FEFFER

KENNETH R. FREEMAN

CAROLYN B. KUHL

AMY D. HOGUE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

WALSH/SHEA CORRIDOR CONSTRUCTORS

CONSTRUCTORS WALSH/SHEA CORRIDOR

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

HNTB CORPORATION

Cross Defendants

J.F. SHEA CONSTRUCTION INC.

WALSH CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

CONSTRUCTORS WALSH/SHEA CORRIDOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

HANSON BRIDGETT LLP

HENNIGH SCOTT E.

REID CARTER B.

MCPHERSON DAVID FLIPPIN

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

WITTBRODT RICHARD J. ESQ.

GRIFFIN MELISSA L.

PATRICK JOHN BENJAMIN

KORNBLATT SARA HILARY

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

WITTBRODT RICHARD JOHN ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Demurrer

2/13/2018: Demurrer

Minute Order

3/7/2018: Minute Order

Declaration

7/20/2018: Declaration

Other -

8/28/2018: Other -

Other -

8/29/2018: Other -

Other -

9/6/2018: Other -

Opposition

11/13/2018: Opposition

Response

11/13/2018: Response

Response

11/13/2018: Response

Minute Order

12/10/2018: Minute Order

Unknown

1/14/2019: Unknown

Unknown

2/22/2019: Unknown

Status Report

3/26/2019: Status Report

Case Management Order

1/17/2018: Case Management Order

Demurrer

12/22/2017: Demurrer

Summons

11/22/2017: Summons

Order

10/25/2017: Order

Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter

10/25/2017: Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter

101 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2019
  • Message Board Posting (On Message Board); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • Order (Granting Verified Application of Carter B. Reid to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice); Filed by Walsh/Shea Corridor Constructors (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • Commission to Take Deposition Outside California; Filed by HNTB Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • Verified Application of Carter B. Reid to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice; Filed by Carter B. Reid (Attorney); Walsh/Shea Corridor Constructors (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by Walsh/Shea Corridor Constructors (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • at 2:00 PM in Department 7, Amy D. Hogue, Presiding; Further Status Conference ((Telephonic)) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference (Telephonic))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • at 2:00 PM in Department 7, Amy D. Hogue, Presiding; Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Vienna Nguyen, CSR No. 13137); Filed by Walsh/Shea Corridor Constructors (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
203 More Docket Entries
  • 06/09/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Walsh/Shea Corridor Constructors (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR (1) BREACH OF WRITTEN CON1RACT,ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • CERTIFICAT OF MERIT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONSTRUCTORS WALSH/SHEA CORRIDOR is a litigant

Latest cases where HNTB CORPORATION A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where WALSH CONSTRUCTION COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where WALSH SHEA CORRIDOR CONSTRUCTORS A BUSINESS OF FORM UNKNOWN; is a litigant