This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/29/2022 at 17:32:26 (UTC).

WALLACE TJADER, VS CRANE CO., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/22/2022 WALLACE TJADER filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against CRANE CO . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3615

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TJADER WALLACE

Defendants

CRANE CO.

CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY INC.

FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION FKA THE CARBORUNDUM COMPANY

JOHN CRANE INC.

PARAMOUNT GLOBAL FKA VIACOMCBS INC FKA CBS CORPORATION A DELAWARE CORPORATION FKA VIACOM INC. SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION FKA WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

SOCO WEST INC

UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOLDSTEIN BENJAMIN DAVID

 

Court Documents

Complaint

4/22/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/22/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/22/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice - PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET

4/22/2022: Notice - PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/22/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/26/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Wallace Tjader, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketPreliminary Fact Sheet; Filed by Wallace Tjader, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Wallace Tjader, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Wallace Tjader, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Wallace Tjader, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION FKA THE CARBORUNDUM COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where SOCO WEST INC. is a litigant