This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/29/2021 at 07:06:33 (UTC).

WALKER, KACY VS WALKER, AARON

Case Summary

On 01/29/2021 WALKER, KACY filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against WALKER, AARON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0145

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WALKER KACY

Respondent

WALKER AARON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

TWINING CHRISTINE V

Respondent Attorney

STERNBERG CAROL

 

Court Documents

Notice - Case Assignment

2/2/2021: Notice - Case Assignment

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

2/2/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

1/29/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

1/29/2021: Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

Summons - Issued

1/29/2021: Summons - Issued

Declaration - UCCJEA

1/29/2021: Declaration - UCCJEA

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

3/8/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Declaration - UCCJEA

3/4/2021: Declaration - UCCJEA

Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

3/4/2021: Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

Proof of Service of Summons

2/19/2021: Proof of Service of Summons

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketResponse - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketSummons (Issued ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STERNBERG CAROL