This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/21/2021 at 09:34:11 (UTC).

WALID WAIMRIN, ET AL. VS LAURA BALVERDE-SANCHEZ, AS TRUSTEE OF THE LAURA BALVERDE-SANCHEZ TRUST

Case Summary

On 12/21/2020 WALID WAIMRIN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LAURA BALVERDE-SANCHEZ, AS TRUSTEE OF THE LAURA BALVERDE-SANCHEZ TRUST. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD L. FRUIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8708

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RICHARD L. FRUIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

WAIMRIN WALID

SEFFKER JOHN

BLACK DIAMOND STUDIOS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

MINDRIOT LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

WAIMRIN WALID AKA PETE WAIMRIN

MINDRIOT LLC

BLACK DIAMOND STUDIOS INC.

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

BALVERDE-SANCHEZ LAURA AS TRUSTEE OF THE LAURA BALVERDE-SANCHEZ TRUST

BALAVERDE-SANCHEZ LAURA AS TRUSTEE

BALVERDE-SANCHEZ LAURA AS TRUSTEE OF THE LAURA BLAVERDE-SANCHEZ TRUST

BALVERDE-SANCHEZ LAURA

BALVERDE-SANCHEZ LAURA AS SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

RICHMAN STEVEN N

RICHMAN STEVEN N.

Defendant Attorneys

JOHNSON EINAR WILLIAM

JOHNSON EINAR WM.

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/19/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

4/29/2021: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/10/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/21/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Case Management Statement

4/22/2021: Case Management Statement

Answer

4/26/2021: Answer

Case Management Statement

4/27/2021: Case Management Statement

Cross-Complaint

4/27/2021: Cross-Complaint

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

4/1/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/9/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Lis Pendens

12/30/2020: Notice of Lis Pendens

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/21/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/22/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/22/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

12/22/2020: Complaint

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2021
  • Hearing06/09/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 15 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by Walid Waimrin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketSummons (Cross-Complaint); Filed by Laura Balverde-Sanchez, as successor Trustee (Cross-Complainant); Laura Balverde-Sanchez (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Laura Balverde-Sanchez, as successor Trustee (Cross-Complainant); Laura Balverde-Sanchez (Cross-Complainant); Laura Balverde-Sanchez, individually Erroneously Sued As Laura Balverde-Sanchez, as trustee of the Laura Blaverde-Sanchez Trust (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Laura Balverde-Sanchez, as successor Trustee (Cross-Complainant); Laura Balverde-Sanchez (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketAnswer (of Defendant Laura Balverde-Sanchez to Unverified Complaint); Filed by Laura Balverde-Sanchez, individually Erroneously Sued As Laura Balverde-Sanchez, as trustee of the Laura Blaverde-Sanchez Trust (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Walid Waimrin (Plaintiff); John Seffker (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by Walid Waimrin (Plaintiff); John Seffker (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Walid Waimrin (Plaintiff); John Seffker (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by Walid Waimrin (Plaintiff); John Seffker (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Walid Waimrin (Plaintiff); John Seffker (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Walid Waimrin (Plaintiff); John Seffker (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Walid Waimrin (Plaintiff); John Seffker (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOHNSON EINAR WM. ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOHNSON EINAR WILLIAM