This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2023 at 13:02:50 (UTC).

WALBERTO PEREZ VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES, A GOVERNMENT ENTITY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 WALBERTO PEREZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CITY OF LOS ANGELES, A GOVERNMENT ENTITY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0783

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEREZ WALBERTO

Defendants

CITY OF LOS ANGELES A GOVERNMENT ENTITY

MARTINEZ ALMA SORAYDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MENDEZ GIANCARLO

 

Court Documents

Complaint

1/13/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/13/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/13/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

1/13/2023: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Unknown - EIGHTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

1/13/2023: Unknown - EIGHTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/13/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/13/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2025
  • Hearing01/10/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2024
  • Hearing07/12/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2024
  • Hearing06/28/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Walberto Perez (Plaintiff); As to: City of Los Angeles, a government entity (Defendant); Alma Sorayda Martinez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 01/10/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 29 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Walberto Perez (Plaintiff); As to: City of Los Angeles, a government entity (Defendant); Alma Sorayda Martinez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Walberto Perez (Plaintiff); As to: City of Los Angeles, a government entity (Defendant); Alma Sorayda Martinez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEighth Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 06/28/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/12/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less