This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/13/2020 at 14:44:07 (UTC).

WAJIH AJIB ET AL VS MARIA JUANITA OCASIO

Case Summary

On 04/13/2018 WAJIH AJIB filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MARIA JUANITA OCASIO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GEORGINA T. RIZK, KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE and MARK A. BORENSTEIN. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2061

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GEORGINA T. RIZK

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

MARK A. BORENSTEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

AJIB JAMEL

AJIB WAJIH

Defendants and Respondents

OCASIO MARIA JUANITA

DOES 1 TO 25

FREEMAN CHARLES

Guardian Ad Litem

AJIB WAJIH AND INDIVIDUALLY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

YARRA LAW GROUP

KHARAZI HADI-TY SEYEDIN

KHARAZI HADI-TY SEYEDIN ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

DEBORAH K. PETERSON

PETERSON DEBORAH K.

WEBB SHARON KAY ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

4/10/2020: Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEME...) OF 12/26/2019

12/26/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEME...) OF 12/26/2019

Notice of Settlement

12/26/2019: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEME...)

12/26/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEME...)

Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

1/3/2020: Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account

2/10/2020: Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account

Summons - SUMMONS AMENDED

10/3/2019: Summons - SUMMONS AMENDED

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

8/1/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Request for Dismissal

9/6/2019: Request for Dismissal

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

8/23/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

8/20/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER -

7/23/2018: ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER -

ANSWER-PERSONAL INJURY PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH -

7/23/2018: ANSWER-PERSONAL INJURY PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

7/26/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

5/29/2018: NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM - CIVIL EX PARTE

5/29/2018: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM - CIVIL EX PARTE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER -

4/13/2018: ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER -

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER -

4/13/2018: ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER -

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Jamel Ajib (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketReceipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account; Filed by Wajih Ajib (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Mark A. Borenstein, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Mark A. Borenstein, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise (Filed by Petitioner and Guardian Ad Litem, Wajih Ajib and to Minor Claimant, Jamel Ajib) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketOrder to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account; Filed by Wajih Ajib (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise Filed by Pe...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketOrder Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability (Miscellaneous); Filed by Wajih Ajib (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketPetition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim; Filed by Wajih Ajib (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Mark A. Borenstein, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 04/13/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • DocketRequest-Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jamel Ajib (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • DocketRequest-Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC702061    Hearing Date: February 10, 2020    Dept: 29

Ajib, et al. v. Ocasio

ADMONITION TO COUNSEL REGARDING FILING OF DOCUMENTS

Pursuant to the First Amended General Order filed on 5/3/19 regarding mandatory electronic filing, electronic documents must be bookmarked within the document pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 3.1110(f)(4). Electronic bookmarks must include links to the first page of each bookmarked item (e.g. exhibits, declarations, deposition excerpts) and with bookmark titles that identify the book-marked item. The item must be briefly described.

Attachments to primary documents must also be bookmarked. Examples include, but are not limited to the following: depositions, declarations, exhibits, transcripts, medical records, and points and authorities. Use of hyperlinks within documents, including attachments and exhibits is strongly encouraged.

Regardless of the time of electronic filing, a printed courtesy copy (along with proof of electronic submission) is required for pleadings and motions including attachments of 26 pages or more, pleadings and motions that include points and authorities, demurrers, motions for summary judgment/adjudication, and motions to compel further discovery, among other documents. Amended General Order, ¶ 9.

Counsel is admonished to comply with the First Amended General Order and Cal Rules of Court 3.110(f)(4) for all future electronically filed documents.

TENTATIVE RULING

The Court finds good cause to dispense with the personal appearance of the guardian ad litem and the minor pursuant to California Rules of Court Rule 7.952. Having reviewed the Petition to Approve Compromise of Pending Action of a Minor (Jamel Ajib, Age 15), the Court finds that the settlement is reasonable, and based thereon, approves and GRANTS the petition.

The Court has considered the Declaration of H. Ty Kharazi in support of the fee request. The Court finds that on the current record and in consideration of the factors set forth in Cal Rules of Court, Rule 7.955(b) a fee of 25% of the gross settlement is reasonable.

The Court approves the following distribution of the settlement proceeds:

Attorney’s fees (25%) $1,750.00

Medical expenses 2,532.75

Costs 825.00

Total fees and costs $5,107.75

Total Settlement $7,000.00

Less credits -5,107.75

Net Settlement $1,892.25

The Court sets an OSC re Receipt and Acknowledgement of Order for the Deposit of Money into Blocked Account (on 6/8/2020 at 8:30 AM). No appearance is required if receipt (MC-356) is filed.

Moving party to give notice.