This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/20/2021 at 01:41:05 (UTC).

WAJEEHAH WASHINGTON, ET AL. VS LEONARDO APARTMENTS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/15/2021 WAJEEHAH WASHINGTON filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against LEONARDO APARTMENTS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAURICE A. LEITER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9934

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAURICE A. LEITER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WASHINGTON WAJEEHAH

Defendants

LEONARDO APARTMENTS

LONG BEACH AFFORDABLE HOUSING COALITION INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARTIYELI JACOB O.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

9/9/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

8/24/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

8/24/2021: Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

8/24/2021: Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/24/2021

8/24/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/24/2021

Notice of Settlement

7/20/2021: Notice of Settlement

Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proc - EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PRO

7/20/2021: Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proc - EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PRO

Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proc - EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PRO

7/20/2021: Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proc - EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PRO

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 07/21/2021

7/21/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 07/21/2021

Case Management Statement

5/25/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

5/27/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/28/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/24/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Complaint

3/15/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

3/15/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/15/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

3/15/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2021
  • Hearing09/20/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 54 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 54, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 54, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 08/24/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketOrder Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability (Miscellaneous); Filed by Wajeehah Washington (Plaintiff); Christopher Degroot (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketOrder Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability (Miscellaneous); Filed by Wajeehah Washington (Plaintiff); Samijah Degroote (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 54, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 54, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Wajeehah Washington (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Wajeehah Washington (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Wajeehah Washington (Plaintiff); Samijah Degroote (Plaintiff); Christopher Degroot (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Wajeehah Washington (Plaintiff); Samijah Degroote (Plaintiff); Christopher Degroot (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Wajeehah Washington (Plaintiff); Samijah Degroote (Plaintiff); Christopher Degroot (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Wajeehah Washington (Plaintiff); Samijah Degroote (Plaintiff); Christopher Degroot (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LONG BEACH AFFORDABLE HOUSING COALITION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where LEONARDO APARTMENTS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARTIYELI JACOB O